NV AB446 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 573.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 573.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to economic development; revising the Nevada New Markets Jobs Act; revising provisions governing investments in, or loans to, qualified active low-income community businesses by certain qualified community development entities; authorizing an additional amount of investments to be made in qualified community development entities in exchange for certain tax credits; revising provisions governing the recapture of tax credits issued in exchange for an investment in a qualified community development entity; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises the Nevada New Markets Jobs Act. (BDR 18-1100)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Chapter 573. |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To committee. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 5, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 408.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer. |