NV AB445 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to mental health; authorizing the Office of Economic Development to grant a partial abatement of property taxes, business taxes and sales and use taxes to a business that locates or expands in this State and that provides mental health services for children; establishing a credit against the modified business tax on certain businesses for taxpayers who donate money to the Account to Improve Mental Health Services for Children; clarifying that facilities providing mental health services for children are eligible for loans and financial assistance from the Nevada State Infrastructure Bank; creating the Account to Improve Mental Health Services for Children to provide supplemental rates or enhanced rates of reimbursement to a recipient of Medicaid who is a child for mental health services; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to the mental health of children. (BDR 32-1004)
Sponsors
Rep. Sabra Newby [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2023-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/82nd2023/Bill/10444/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/82nd2023/Bills/AB/AB445.pdf |