NV AB445 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 572.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to taxation; requiring certain persons who facilitate retail sales of tangible personal property in this State to collect and remit sales and use taxes owed on such retail sales which they facilitate; providing that certain persons who facilitate retail sales of tangible personal property in this State are not liable for the failure to collect and remit sales and use taxes under certain circumstances; authorizing the Department of Taxation to adopt regulations to require certain persons who list or advertise products to customers in this State to collect and remit sales and use taxes unless certain notice and reporting requirements are met; making an appropriation; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing sales and use taxes. (BDR 32-797)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13AssemblyChapter 572.
2019-06-12AssemblyApproved by the Governor.
2019-06-07AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-06-03AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2019-06-03SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-06-02SenateRead second time.
2019-06-02SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-06-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-05-30SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To committee.
2019-05-30SenateIn Senate.
2019-05-30AssemblyTo Senate.
2019-05-30AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-05-30AssemblyTo printer.
2019-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 6, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.)
2019-05-30AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2019-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1024.)
2019-05-30AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2019-05-30AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-16AssemblyRereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee.
2019-04-16AssemblyTaken from General File.
2019-04-16AssemblyRead second time.
2019-04-15AssemblyFrom committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-04-10AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-25AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback