NV AB445 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions governing transportation network companies. (BDR 57-1027)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing transportation network companies. (BDR 57-1027)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06Assembly(No further action taken.)
2017-05-26AssemblyBill read. Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
2017-05-25AssemblyReturned to Assembly with Governor's veto message.
2017-05-25AssemblyVetoed by the Governor.
2017-05-23AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-05-18AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2017-05-17SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly.
2017-05-16SenateRead second time.
2017-05-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-04-26SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.
2017-04-26SenateIn Senate.
2017-04-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 4.) To Senate.
2017-04-24AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-04-21AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-04-21AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-20AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 361.) To printer.
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-10AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-03-29AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-27AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback