NV AB445 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 508.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Makes various changes relating to redevelopment. (BDR 22-1100)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes various changes relating to redevelopment. (BDR 22-1100)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-10AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 508.
2015-06-08AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-06-02AssemblyTo enrollment.
2015-06-01AssemblySenate Amendment No. 1069 concurred in.
2015-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2015-06-01SenateDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2015-06-01SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint .
2015-06-01SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1069.) To printer.
2015-06-01SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2015-06-01SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-06-01SenateRe-referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
2015-06-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-06-01SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
2015-06-01SenateIn Senate.
2015-06-01AssemblyTo Senate.
2015-06-01AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2015-05-31AssemblyTo printer.
2015-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 6, Excused: 2.)
2015-05-31AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2015-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1037.)
2015-05-31AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2015-05-31AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-04-21AssemblyRereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee.
2015-04-21AssemblyTaken from General File.
2015-04-21AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-04-21AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2015-04-20AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 637.) To printer.
2015-04-20AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2015-04-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-03-25AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2015-03-23AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Reports/history.cfm?ID=988
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/AB/AB445.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/AB/AB409.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/AB/AB445_R1.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/AB/AB445_R2.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/AB/AB445_R3.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/AB/AB445_EN.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1253&fldReprint=2&fldDocTypeCode=AB&fldBillNumber=445&fldBillname=AB445
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1327&fldReprint=4&fldDocTypeCode=AB&fldBillNumber=445&fldBillname=AB445
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1328&fldReprint=4&fldDocTypeCode=AB&fldBillNumber=445&fldBillname=AB445

Bill Comments

feedback