NV AB445 | 2013 | 77th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 363.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to public bodies. (BDR 19-1121)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to public bodies. (BDR 19-1121)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-02AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 363.
2013-06-01AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2013-05-30AssemblyTo enrollment.
2013-05-29AssemblySenate Amendment No. 599 concurred in.
2013-05-27AssemblyIn Assembly.
2013-05-24SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2013-05-23SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2013-05-22SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2013-05-21SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2013-05-21SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2013-05-20SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 599.) To printer.
2013-05-20SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2013-05-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2013-04-17SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
2013-04-17SenateIn Senate.
2013-04-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2013-04-15AssemblyRead second time.
2013-04-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2013-03-26AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2013-03-25AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback