NV AB444 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 236.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 236.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sets forth certain requirements relating to the search and seizure of the property of an attorney. (BDR 14-1072)
Title
Sets forth certain requirements relating to the search and seizure of the property of an attorney. (BDR 14-1072)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 236. |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-21 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |