NV AB44 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-15 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the waiver of certain fees for certain veteran-owned businesses. (BDR 7-423)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the waiver of certain fees for certain veteran-owned businesses. (BDR 7-423)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-15Assembly(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
2017-04-03AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-02-10AssemblyRereferred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.
2017-02-10AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2017-02-06AssemblyRead first time. To committee.
2016-11-21AssemblyFrom printer.
2016-11-17AssemblyPrefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback