NV AB431 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Chapter 255.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to convicted persons; revising provisions governing the right to vote for convicted persons, and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to the right to vote for a convicted person. (BDR 14-981)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30AssemblyChapter 255.
2019-05-29AssemblyApproved by the Governor.
2019-05-25AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-23AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2019-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To Assembly.
2019-05-21SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-20SenateRead second time.
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 9, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 190.) To printer.
2019-04-22AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-25AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback