NV AB430 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the interim Nevada Task Force on Retirement Security. (BDR S-1035)
Title
Creates the interim Nevada Task Force on Retirement Security. (BDR S-1035)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | Notice of exemption. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/history.cfm?ID=950 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/AB/AB430.pdf |