NV AB426 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to mortgage lending. (BDR 54-42)
Title
Revises provisions relating to mortgage lending. (BDR 54-42)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2013-04-12 | Assembly | From Concurrent Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections: Do pass. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | To Concurrent Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | From Concurrent Committee on Commerce and Labor: Do pass. |
2013-03-26 | Assembly | From printer. To committees. |
2013-03-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Concurrent Committees on Commerce and Labor and Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Reports/history.cfm?ID=982 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Bills/AB/AB426.pdf |