NV AB415 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; directing the Legislative Committee on Education to conduct an interim study of the statewide system of accountability for public schools; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Provides for an interim study on public school accountability. (BDR S-752)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/8047/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/AB/AB415.pdf |