NV AB415 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 164.
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 164.
Summary
Makes various changes concerning the organization of county offices in certain smaller counties. (BDR 20-507)
Title
Makes various changes concerning the organization of county offices in certain smaller counties. (BDR 20-507)
Sponsors
Rep. John Carpenter [R] | Rep. Edwin Goedhart [R] | Sen. Pete Goicoechea [R] | Rep. Tom Grady [R] |
Sen. Joseph Hardy [R] | Sen. Dean Rhoads [R] | Sen. James Settelmeyer [R] | Rep. Lynn Stewart [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 164. | |
2009-05-18 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-16 | Senate Amendment No. 583 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-13 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-12 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-11 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-08 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-06 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-06 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-05-05 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 583.) To printer. | |
2009-05-04 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-14 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. | |
2009-04-14 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-13 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-10 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-09 | Read second time. | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-09 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-03-18 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=803 |