NV AB414 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 411.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 411.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a course of study in health to include, to the extent money is available for this purpose, instruction in cardiopulmonary resuscitation and the use of an automated external defibrillator for certain grade levels. (BDR 34-204)
Title
Requires a course of study in health to include, to the extent money is available for this purpose, instruction in cardiopulmonary resuscitation and the use of an automated external defibrillator for certain grade levels. (BDR 34-204)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 411. |
2013-06-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2013-06-02 | Assembly | To enrollment. |
2013-06-01 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 918 concurred in. |
2013-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 918.) To printer. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. |
2013-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2013-04-19 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 344.) To printer. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-04-12 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2013-03-22 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |