NV AB413 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 43.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 43.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to transportation; requiring the Department of Transportation to establish an Advisory Working Group to Study Certain Issues Related to Transportation during the 2021-2022 interim; prescribing the membership and duties of the Advisory Working Group; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Requires the Department of Transportation to establish an Advisory Working Group to Study Certain Issues Related to Transportation during the 2021-2022 interim. (BDR S-458)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 43. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 379.) |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer. |