NV AB41 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - To committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to vehicles; revising provisions governing the application and issuance of certain permits by the Department of Transportation for the operation of certain vehicles; authorizing the Department to grant a waiver from the maximum width of oversized manufactured or mobile homes or similar structures; revising provisions governing the measurement of the height, length and width of certain vehicles carrying loads; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing the operation of certain vehicles. (BDR 43-346)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-04AssemblyTo committee.
2021-02-01AssemblyRead first time.
2020-12-22AssemblyFrom printer.
2020-11-18AssemblyPrefiled. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback