NV AB408 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to Medicaid and health insurance. (BDR 38-957)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to Medicaid and health insurance. (BDR 38-957)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-16AssemblyVetoed by the Governor.
2017-06-05AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-03AssemblySenate Amendment Nos. 869 and 967 concurred in. To enrollment.
2017-05-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint . To Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateTo printer.
2017-05-26SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.)
2017-05-26SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2017-05-26SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 967.)
2017-05-25SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-25SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
2017-05-24SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 869.) To printer.
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-05-24SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-26SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2017-04-26SenateIn Senate.
2017-04-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 15.) To Senate.
2017-04-24AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-04-24AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-21AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 568.) To printer.
2017-04-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-22AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-20AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback