NV AB408 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 419.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 419.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing business impact statements prepared by state agencies and governing bodies of local governments. (BDR 18-416)
Title
Revises provisions governing business impact statements prepared by state agencies and governing bodies of local governments. (BDR 18-416)
Sponsors
Sen. Dina Neal [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 419. |
2013-06-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2013-06-02 | Assembly | To enrollment. |
2013-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Read second time. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. |
2013-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 400.) To printer. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-04-12 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2013-03-20 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2013-03-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |