NV AB405 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 589.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes certain protections for and ensures the rights of a person who uses renewable energy in this State and revises provisions governing net metering. (BDR 52-959)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes certain protections for and ensures the rights of a person who uses renewable energy in this State and revises provisions governing net metering. (BDR 52-959)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 589.
2017-06-08AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-04AssemblySenate Amendment No. 1100 concurred in. To enrollment.
2017-06-04AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-06-04SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-06-04SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
2017-06-03SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1100.) To printer.
2017-06-03SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-06-03SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-05-23SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.
2017-05-23SenateIn Senate.
2017-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 2, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
2017-05-23AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-05-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 723.) To printer.
2017-05-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-13AssemblyWaiver granted effective: April 12, 2017.
2017-03-22AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-20AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback