NV AB405 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions regulating certain abortions. (BDR 40-755)
Title
Revises provisions regulating certain abortions. (BDR 40-755)
Sponsors
Sen. Ira Hansen [R] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Health and Human Services. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-04-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 24, Nays: 17, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2015-04-17 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 536.) To printer. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Judiciary. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2015-03-20 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-17 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |