NV AB404 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Nevada Office of the Inspector General. (BDR 18-740)
Title
Creates the Nevada Office of the Inspector General. (BDR 18-740)
Sponsors
Rep. Brittney Miller [D] | Rep. William McCurdy [D] | Rep. Teresa Benitez-Thompson [D] | Sen. Chris Brooks [D] |
Rep. Christopher Edwards [R] | Rep. Ozzie Fumo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 492.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-04-10 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |