NV AB404 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-16 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-16 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions concerning firearms. (BDR 15-840)
Title
Revises provisions concerning firearms. (BDR 15-840)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-16 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.) |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 7.) To Senate. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 551.) To printer. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-17 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |