NV AB402 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-13 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-13 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the legalization and taxation of marijuana. (BDR 15-1069)
Title
Provides for the legalization and taxation of marijuana. (BDR 15-1069)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-13 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2013-03-20 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2013-03-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |