NV AB40 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 341.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 341.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises the requirements concerning background investigations of certain applicants for employment or contracts with private postsecondary educational institutions. (BDR 34-442)
Title
Revises the requirements concerning background investigations of certain applicants for employment or contracts with private postsecondary educational institutions. (BDR 34-442)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-13 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 341. | |
2011-06-06 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-06-04 | To enrollment. | |
2011-06-04 | Conference report adopted by Senate. | |
2011-06-03 | From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 599. Conference report adopted by Assembly. | |
2011-05-30 | Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee. | |
2011-05-30 | In Assembly. | |
2011-05-29 | Senate Amendment No. 599 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly. | |
2011-05-26 | In Senate. | |
2011-05-25 | Senate Amendment No. 599 not concurred in. To Senate. | |
2011-05-23 | In Assembly. | |
2011-05-20 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-05-19 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-05-19 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-05-18 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 599.) To printer. | |
2011-05-16 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-02-28 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. | |
2011-02-28 | In Senate. | |
2011-02-24 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 3.) To Senate. | |
2011-02-23 | Read second time. | |
2011-02-22 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-02-07 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2010-12-16 | From printer. | |
2010-12-14 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |