NV AB397 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Chapter 319.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to misconduct by certain public officers; authorizing the Nevada Equal Rights Commission to recommend removal of certain public officers under certain circumstances; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing misconduct by certain public officers. (BDR 18-1038)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05AssemblyChapter 319.
2019-06-03AssemblyApproved by the Governor.
2019-06-01AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-27AssemblySenate Amendment No. 825 concurred in. To enrollment.
2019-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-05-23SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2019-05-23SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
2019-05-22SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 825.) To printer.
2019-05-21SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
2019-04-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 4, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 237.) To printer.
2019-04-22AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-22AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-21AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback