NV AB39 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter 123.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to governmental financial administration; revising provisions governing the deposit of state money by the State Treasurer; revising provisions relating to the holding of certain securities as collateral against deposits of public money in certain circumstances; revising the provisions governing the program established by the State Treasurer for the monitoring of certain collateral maintained by certain depositories; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to governmental financial administration. (BDR 31-477)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24AssemblyChapter 123.
2019-05-23AssemblyApproved by the Governor.
2019-05-22AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-21AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2019-05-20SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2019-05-16SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-15SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-14SenateRead second time.
2019-05-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-17SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
2019-04-17SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
2019-04-15AssemblyRead second time.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-02-04AssemblyRead first time. To committee.
2018-11-20AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-11-16AssemblyPrefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback