NV AB375 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 557.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Allows the imposition of certain taxes, fees, rates, charges, levies or assessments in a county to fund approved flood management projects of a flood management authority based on the recommendations of a flood control project needs committee. (BDR S-473)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows the imposition of certain taxes, fees, rates, charges, levies or assessments in a county to fund approved flood management projects of a flood management authority based on the recommendations of a flood control project needs committee. (BDR S-473)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 557.
2017-06-08AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-04AssemblySenate Amendment No. 771 concurred in. To enrollment.
2017-05-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 14, Nays: 7.) To Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
2017-05-25SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 771.) To printer.
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-26SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To committee.
2017-04-26SenateIn Senate.
2017-04-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 3.) To Senate.
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-24AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 439.) To printer.
2017-04-24AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-22AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-20AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback