NV AB375 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revises certain provisions concerning public schools. (BDR 34-806)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises certain provisions concerning public schools. (BDR 34-806)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-22Assembly(No further action taken.)
2015-04-21AssemblyRead third time. Lost. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 22.)
2015-04-20AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2015-04-17AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2015-04-17AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-04-16AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 535.) To printer.
2015-04-15AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File for next legislative day.
2015-04-15AssemblyTaken from Second Reading File.
2015-04-14AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-04-08AssemblyRereferred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2015-04-08AssemblyFrom committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Judiciary.
2015-03-19AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2015-03-17AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback