NV AB374 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the Department of Health and Human Services, if authorized by federal law, to establish a health care plan within Medicaid for purchase by persons who are not otherwise eligible for Medicaid. (BDR 38-881)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the Department of Health and Human Services, if authorized by federal law, to establish a health care plan within Medicaid for purchase by persons who are not otherwise eligible for Medicaid. (BDR 38-881)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-16AssemblyVetoed by the Governor.
2017-06-05AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-03AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2017-06-02SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly.
2017-06-01SenateRead second time.
2017-06-01SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-06-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-05-31SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2017-05-31SenateIn Senate.
2017-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 13, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
2017-05-30AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2017-05-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass, as amended.
2017-05-22AssemblyTo committee.
2017-05-22AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-05-19AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 745.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2017-05-18AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-12AssemblyWaiver granted effective: April 12, 2017.
2017-03-22AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-20AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback