NV AB371 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 574.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the State Land Registrar to facilitate the restoration and preservation of certain historic buildings by entering into a public-private partnership. (BDR 26-883)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the State Land Registrar to facilitate the restoration and preservation of certain historic buildings by entering into a public-private partnership. (BDR 26-883)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-13AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 574.
2017-06-05AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-04AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2017-06-03SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-06-02SenateRead second time.
2017-06-02SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-06-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-06-01SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate.
2017-06-01AssemblyTo Senate.
2017-06-01AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-06-01AssemblyTo printer.
2017-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 3.)
2017-06-01AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2017-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 999.)
2017-06-01AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2017-06-01AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-23AssemblyNotice of exemption.
2017-03-22AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-20AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback