NV AB371 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-25 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 181.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes provisions governing the destruction of certain physical evidence. (BDR 4-734)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes provisions governing the destruction of certain physical evidence. (BDR 4-734)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-25AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 181.
2015-05-19AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-05-18AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2015-05-17SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 3.) To Assembly.
2015-05-16SenateRead second time.
2015-05-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-04-23SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2015-04-23SenateIn Senate.
2015-04-21AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 12.) To Senate.
2015-04-21AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-04-20AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 548.) To printer.
2015-04-20AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2015-04-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-03-19AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2015-03-17AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback