NV AB37 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 382.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 382.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the support of children; defining certain terms and revising certain definitions relating to the support of children; requiring the reporting and withholding of lump sum payments by income payers under certain circumstances; revising provisions relating to the amount of income that may be withheld from an obligor; making various changes relating to the withholding of income by income payers; authorizing the imposition of certain penalties on income payers who commit certain improper acts relating to lump sum payments; expressly authorizing the assignment of money from certain lump sum payments; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to the enforcement of obligations for the support of children. (BDR 3-301)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 382. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 787 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. To Assembly. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | To printer. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 787.) |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 10.) To Senate. |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 506.) To printer. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | To committee. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 77.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Taken from Second Reading File. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | To committee. |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-12-22 | Assembly | From printer. |
2020-11-18 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |