NV AB365 | 2013 | 77th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-01 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 308.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises certain provisions relating to court interpreters. (BDR 1-483)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises certain provisions relating to court interpreters. (BDR 1-483)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-01AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 308.
2013-05-31AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2013-05-28AssemblyTo enrollment.
2013-05-27AssemblyIn Assembly.
2013-05-24SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2013-05-24SenateTaken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
2013-05-21SenateTaken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
2013-05-20SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2013-05-18SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2013-05-17SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2013-05-16SenateRead second time.
2013-05-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2013-04-16SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2013-04-16SenateIn Senate.
2013-04-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 4, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2013-04-15AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2013-04-12AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 124.) To printer.
2013-04-10AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File for next legislative day.
2013-04-10AssemblyTaken from Second Reading File.
2013-04-09AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2013-04-09AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2013-03-20AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2013-03-18AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback