NV AB362 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 556.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 556.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to educational personnel. (BDR 34-1144)
Title
Revises provisions relating to educational personnel. (BDR 34-1144)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 556. |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-04 | Assembly | Senate Amendment Nos. 1049 and 1124 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2017-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint . To Assembly. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | To printer. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1124.) |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Action of adoption of amendment rescinded. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Action of passage reconsidered. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1070.) |
2017-06-03 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1049.) To printer. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 603.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |