NV AB36 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 584.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises the Charter of the City of Reno. (BDR S-448)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises the Charter of the City of Reno. (BDR S-448)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-14AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 584.
2017-06-05AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-03AssemblyTo enrollment.
2017-06-03AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2017-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. To printer.
2017-06-02SenateTo Assembly.
2017-06-02SenateSenate Amendment No. 960 receded from.
2017-05-31SenateIn Senate.
2017-05-30AssemblySenate Amendment No. 960 not concurred in. To Senate.
2017-05-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateTo printer.
2017-05-26SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.)
2017-05-26SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2017-05-26SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 960.)
2017-05-26SenateTaken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
2017-05-19SenateTaken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
2017-05-18SenateRead second time.
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-05-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-03-09SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
2017-03-09SenateIn Senate.
2017-03-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2017-03-07AssemblyRead second time.
2017-03-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-02-06AssemblyRead first time. To committee.
2016-11-21AssemblyFrom printer.
2016-11-16AssemblyPrefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback