NV AB359 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 555.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts certain entities that enter into contracts or agreements with the State of Nevada or a political corporation or subdivision of the State from certain provisions relating to contractors. (BDR 54-643)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts certain entities that enter into contracts or agreements with the State of Nevada or a political corporation or subdivision of the State from certain provisions relating to contractors. (BDR 54-643)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 555.
2017-06-08AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05AssemblyTo enrollment.
2017-06-05AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
2017-06-04AssemblyIn Assembly. To printer.
2017-06-04SenateTo Assembly.
2017-06-04SenateSenate Amendment No. 858 receded from.
2017-06-04SenateIn Senate.
2017-06-03AssemblySenate Amendment No. 858 not concurred in. To Senate.
2017-05-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
2017-05-25SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 858.) To printer.
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-26SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.
2017-04-26SenateIn Senate.
2017-04-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.) To Senate.
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-24AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 531.) To printer.
2017-04-24AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-22AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-20AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback