NV AB359 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 347.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 347.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing energy. (BDR 58-1064)
Title
Revises provisions governing energy. (BDR 58-1064)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-13 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 347. | |
2011-06-06 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-06-04 | Senate Amendment No. 875 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2011-06-04 | In Assembly. | |
2011-06-04 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-06-04 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . | |
2011-06-03 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 875.) To printer. | |
2011-06-03 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-06-03 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-05-26 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee. | |
2011-05-26 | In Senate. | |
2011-05-25 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 2.) To Senate. | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on General File. | |
2011-05-25 | From committee: Do pass, as amended. | |
2011-04-27 | Exemption effective. | |
2011-04-27 | To committee. | |
2011-04-27 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-26 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 436.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. | |
2011-04-26 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2011-04-26 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-04-11 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2011-03-23 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-21 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |