NV AB358 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on May 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-20 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on May 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-20 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to health care; creating the Bureau of Emergency Medical Services in the State Fire Marshal Division of the Department of Public Safety; transferring to the Bureau certain duties related to emergency medical services; revising the membership of the Committee on Emergency Medical Services; requiring the State Fire Marshal to appoint a Chief of the Bureau; making various other changes relating to emergency medical services; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing emergency medical services. (BDR 40-859)
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Gray [R] | Rep. Philip O'Neill [R] | Sen. Jeff Stone [R] | Rep. Rich DeLong [R] |
Rep. Jill Dickman [R] | Rep. Danielle Gallant [R] | Rep. Brian Hibbetts [R] | Rep. Gregory Koenig [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-21 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-20 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.) |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 1, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 487.) To printer. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-03-21 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |