NV AB358 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 366.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 366.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to Medicaid; requiring the suspension, rather than termination, of eligibility for Medicaid of a person who is incarcerated; authorizing a person who is incarcerated, in certain circumstances, to apply for enrollment in Medicaid before he or she is released; revising the requirement for the Director of the Department of Corrections to complete the paperwork to enroll such a person in Medicaid; making an appropriation; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Enacts provisions to improve access to Medicaid for persons released from incarceration. (BDR 38-919)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 366. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 2, Not voting: 1.) To Senate. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 674.) To printer. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |