NV AB355 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 441.
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 441.
Summary
Revises provisions related to certain public utilities that furnish water or sewage disposal. (BDR 58-693)
Title
Revises provisions related to certain public utilities that furnish water or sewage disposal. (BDR 58-693)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-03 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 441. | |
2009-06-01 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-31 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-31 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Absent: 1.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-31 | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. | |
2009-05-30 | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. | |
2009-05-29 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-28 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-28 | Read third time. | |
2009-05-28 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-05-28 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-05-20 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To committee. | |
2009-05-20 | In Senate. | |
2009-05-20 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-05-20 | From committee: Do pass, as amended. | |
2009-04-21 | Exemption effective. | |
2009-04-21 | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. | |
2009-04-21 | Taken from General File. | |
2009-04-21 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-20 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 438.) To printer. | |
2009-04-20 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-20 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-23 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2009-03-17 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=703 |