NV AB349 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-18 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-18 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to crimes; prohibiting sexual conduct between a law enforcement officer and a person who is under arrest or is currently detained by any law enforcement officer; providing a penalty; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Prohibits sexual conduct between a law enforcement officer and a person who is under arrest or is currently detained by any law enforcement officer. (BDR 15-1003)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-18 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 200.) To printer. |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |