NV AB34 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 398.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-08 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 398.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes various changes to provisions governing certain fire protection districts and fire safety. (BDR 42-369)
Title
Makes various changes to provisions governing certain fire protection districts and fire safety. (BDR 42-369)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-08 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 398. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-05-30 | Assembly | To enrollment. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 719 concurred in. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 719.) To printer. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 43.) To printer. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-02-02 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2014-12-22 | Assembly | From printer. |
2014-12-20 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |