NV AB33 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 37.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 37.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Abolishes certain boards, commissions and councils relating to agricultural products. (BDR 40-312)
Title
Abolishes certain boards, commissions and councils relating to agricultural products. (BDR 40-312)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 37. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 4, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2017-04-14 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-13 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-12 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-11 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-11 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 38.) To printer. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2016-11-21 | Assembly | From printer. |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer. |