NV AB326 | 2015 | 78th Legislature


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]


Revises provisions governing motor vehicle registration. (BDR 43-1052)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Revises provisions governing motor vehicle registration. (BDR 43-1052)


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]


2015-06-11AssemblyVetoed by the Governor.
2015-06-08AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-06-04AssemblyTo enrollment.
2015-06-03AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2015-06-01SenateDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2015-06-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-06-01SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.
2015-06-01SenateIn Senate.
2015-06-01AssemblyTo Senate.
2015-06-01AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2015-05-31AssemblyTo printer.
2015-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 3.)
2015-05-31AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2015-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1041.)
2015-05-31AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2015-05-31AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-04-21AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2015-04-20AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 423.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2015-04-17AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-04-06AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2015-03-18AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2015-03-16AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

Bill Comments