NV AB324 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 47.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 47.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to document preparation services. (BDR 19-1091)
Title
Revises provisions relating to document preparation services. (BDR 19-1091)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 47. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.) To Senate. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-21 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 263.) To printer. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |