NV AB321 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 248.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 248.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to elections; establishing procedures for the use of mail ballots in every election; establishing various requirements relating to mail ballots; revising the requirements for signature verification of mail ballots; revising the deadline to submit a request for the establishment of a polling place within an Indian reservation or Indian colony for an election; revising the personal data that may be requested if a voter's signature is challenged at the polls; requiring the Secretary of State to enter into a cooperative agreement with the State Registrar of Vital Statistics to obtain certain information relating to the statewide voter registration list; authorizing a county clerk, city clerk or registrar of voters and deputies thereof charged with powers and duties relating to elections to request certain personal information be maintained in a confidential manner; revising provisions relating to the withdrawal of a petition for initiative or referendum; repealing provisions related to absent ballots, mailing ballots and affected elections; providing a penalty; making an appropriation; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to elections. (BDR 24-927)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 248. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 839 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint. To Assembly. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | To printer. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Amended. (Amend. No. 839.) |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Amendment No. 829 failed. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 25, Nays: 16, Excused: 1.) To printer. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 782.) |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Action of passage reconsidered. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 16.) |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 276.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |