NV AB321 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 59.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 59.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to the use of force. (BDR 15-963)
Title
Revises provisions relating to the use of force. (BDR 15-963)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 59. | |
2011-05-16 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-05-13 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2011-05-11 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-05-10 | Read second time. | |
2011-05-09 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-04-27 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. | |
2011-04-26 | In Senate. | |
2011-04-25 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 3.) To Senate. | |
2011-04-22 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2011-04-21 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-20 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 445.) To printer. | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-04-20 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-03-21 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-18 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |