NV AB291 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to reports of presentence investigations and general investigations. (BDR 14-1076)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to reports of presentence investigations and general investigations. (BDR 14-1076)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 423.
2017-06-05AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-04AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2017-06-03SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-06-02SenateRead second time.
2017-06-02SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-06-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-05-29SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2017-05-29SenateIn Senate.
2017-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
2017-05-29AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2017-05-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass, as amended.
2017-04-21AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-04-20AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 339.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2017-04-20AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-15AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-14AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Corrections, Parole, and Probation. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback