NV AB286 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-11 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-11 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Office of Military Legal Assistance within the Office of the Attorney General. (BDR 18-607)
Title
Creates the Office of Military Legal Assistance within the Office of the Attorney General. (BDR 18-607)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-11 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-13 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Reports/history.cfm?ID=617 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/AB/AB286.pdf |