NV AB280 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 572.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to preferences in bidding for certain contracts for businesses based in this State. (BDR 27-1060)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to preferences in bidding for certain contracts for businesses based in this State. (BDR 27-1060)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-13AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 572.
2017-06-08AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05AssemblyTo enrollment.
2017-06-05AssemblySenate Amendment No. 1057 concurred in.
2017-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-06-02SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-06-02SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
2017-06-01SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1057.) To printer.
2017-06-01SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-06-01SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-05-29SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
2017-05-29SenateIn Senate.
2017-05-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2017-05-26AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass, as amended.
2017-05-19AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-05-18AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 738.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2017-05-17AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-13AssemblyWaiver granted effective: April 12, 2017.
2017-04-03AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-03-14AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-13AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback